FRIENDS OF STEEPLE BUMPSTEAD PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1180898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fosbees raises vital funds to aid the running of the school. We do this by holding events such as bazaars, fetes and discos. We also support the school in helping them put on sponsored events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £9,871
Total expenditure: £9,132

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOSBEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Connor Chair 02 November 2020
None on record
Kelly Woods Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Jennifer Dorling Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Charlotte Harper Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Kelly Onslow Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Radford Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Charlotte Rosbrooke Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Mrs Wendy Cumming Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.16k £6.80k £4.57k £8.19k £9.87k
Total expenditure £5.84k £5.16k £7.22k £11.36k £9.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Steeple Bumpstead Primary School
Bower Hall Drive
Steeple Bumpstead
HAVERHILL
CB9 7ED
Phone:
01440730220