CHRIST FAMILY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christ Family Church undertakes services via worship, prayer and studying the word of God to gain a greater understanding and knowledge of our Lord Jesus Christ. Its purpose is to preach and teach the word of God to the community and provide wide ranges of activities via projects and pastoral care to enhance the advancement of Christianity religion for the people living within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 19 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ABEL ELOHIM | Chair | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANITA CHIAFI | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR PETER WILSON | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £150 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | £0 | £20 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 January 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 January 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN GREATER LONDON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE TEACHINGS OF JESUS CHRIST TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 COSSALL WALK
LONDON
SE15 2TW
- Phone:
- 07789774963
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window