ST PAULS PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There are generally two shows per year, one in the Summer and a Pantomime prior to Christmas. At the start of each year, a local charity is selected by the members and Trustees to receive support and the surplus income generated from the performances during the year. A producer is also selected to develop a script, select a cast, lead and manage rehearsals for the shows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 15 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Hesse | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elizabeth Carter | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Williams | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Williams | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.95k | £3.64k | £3.43k | £5.20k | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.16k | £1.23k | £3.37k | £4.50k | £4.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE DRAMATIC ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENCOURAGING LOCAL PEOPLE WITHIN CHESSINGTON, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO PARTICIPATE IN THE PERFORMANCE OF PLAYS AND EVENTS AND TO ATTEND AND SUPPORT SUCH PLAYS AND EVENTS; AND (2) TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE BY MAKING GRANTS TO LOCAL CHARITIES OFFERING SUPPORT TO THOSE LIVING IN CHESSINGTON, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].”
Area of benefit
WITHIN CHESSINGTON, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 FIRCROFT ROAD
CHESSINGTON
KT9 1RN
- Phone:
- 07855160518
- Email:
- saintpaulsplayers@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window