BELIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BELIVE is an independent befriending service with charity status, for local people with a mild-moderate learning disability aged 18 plus who live in Medway. It can either be face-face, telephone call or both depending on individual need, based on an assessment including a risk assessment. Referrals can be from professionals, other agencies-charities or direct from beneficiaries via our email.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Medway
Governance
- 06 June 2019: CIO registration
- 20 February 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 20 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1188118 EAST KENT MENCAP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.16k | £0 | £11.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.33k | £7.90k | £9.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 21 October 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 21 October 2023 | 21 days late | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jun 2019 as amended on 02 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH ADULTS WITH A MILD TO MODERATE LEARNING DISABILITY IN KENT AND MEDWAY, WHO ARE, OR ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR DISABILITY, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A BEFRIENDING SERVICE DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST SUCH PERSONS, PROVIDE RECREATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AND CO-ORDINATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window