FRIENDS OF EASTWOODS PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting children, young people, elderly and those on low incomes through our food bank, school uniform scheme, community hub providing sports equipment for use within the park. Making environmental improvements in our park. Providing a space for community groups to meet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
Total income includes £8,950 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 14 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Ineson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY DICKINSON | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA BOND | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.86k | £128.10k | £63.44k | £85.95k | £131.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.14k | £78.74k | £64.12k | £132.05k | £122.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £27.67k | £25.12k | £14.50k | £8.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 22 September 2022 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 22 September 2022 | 230 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 22 September 2022 | 594 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PRUDHOE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH A STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Miners Lamp Cafe
Eastwoods Road
PRUDHOE
Northumberland
NE42 5DT
- Phone:
- 07547 616194
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window