FENISCOWLES AND PLEASINGTON WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreation, (childrens playground), Sports (Football, Cricket, Bowls, Tennis) & Leisure. 10.4 acres of greenspace open to the public. Biological Heritage Site (Rare grasses, wild flowers )
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government contract(s) and £9,257 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 25 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Cousins | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jason Boyle | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul David Marrow | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Dermot Gallagher | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|||||
PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|||||
MARK CROSS | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Jane Margaret Green | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vikki Louise Thompson | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christoper Raymond John Green | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £258.21k | £43.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £65.70k | £50.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 | £300 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £44.85k | £9.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 April 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 April 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 21 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FENISCOWLES, BLACKBURN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Feniscowles&Pleasington Rec Ground
Livesey Branch Road
BLACKBURN
BB2 5EG
- Phone:
- 01254208210
- Email:
- fenirec@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window