Financial history SKINNINGROVE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 513154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £10.65k £19.75k £14.53k £6.78k £2.59k
Total expenditure £8.66k £2.95k £23.67k £7.75k £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £19.74k N/A N/A N/A