Accounts and annual returns SHIV SHAKTI MAA MELDI SOCIETY

Charity number: 1181442
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 November 2024 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 30 November 2024 299 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 June 2023 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 12 June 2023 127 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 March 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 15 March 2022 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 19 February 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window