Accounts and annual returns THE GIFT WELLNESS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1182451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 01 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 01 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2022 27 July 2024 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 27 July 2024 330 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 25 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2020 21 March 2022 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2019 06 September 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 Not Required