THE TED SENIOR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our flagship scheme, Ted's Friends, was launched at the University of Bristol at the start of the 2020-21 academic year. The scheme provides TSF funded mental health training to student ambassadors within University sports teams, and following this successful pilot, significant expansion into other Universities is planned. TSF supports the Support after Suicide Partnership (SASP) through grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cameron James Watson | Chair | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Mitchell | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Normand | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donna Louise Boycott | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Max George Senior | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Marjorie Senior | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholas Senior | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Elisabeth Senior | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sapphire Tamara Harwood | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Luke Harwood | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.75k | £52.84k | £70.19k | £82.88k | £39.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.73k | £16.01k | £39.27k | £55.94k | £50.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 May 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND ADVANCE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY REDUCING THE INCIDENCE OF SUICIDE BY YOUNG ADULTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO; YOUNG ADULTS ATTENDING, OR UNDERTAKING A COURSE OF STUDY, OR CONTEMPLATING A COURSE OF STUDY AT UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR OTHER TERTIARY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION THROUGH, INTER ALIA: EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING YOUNG ADULTS, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, RELEVANT PROFESSIONALS, OPINION FORMERS AND OTHERS, AS TO THE MENTAL HEALTH RISKS ASSOCIATED WITH YOUNG ADULTS, AND HOW THE SAME MAY BE REDUCED BY VARIOUS MEANS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, RAISING AWARENESS, GRANT MAKING, THE COMMISSIONING OF RELEVANT RESEARCH, THE DISSEMINATION OF RELEVANT RESEARCH AND OTHER RELEVANT MATERIAL. THE PROVISION OF MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT FOR YOUNG ADULTS BY VARIOUS MEANS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, GRANT MAKING, THE DEVELOPMENT OF A TRAINED AND FOCUSSED VOLUNTEER BASE, THE UTILISATION AND DEPLOYMENT OF RELEVANT PROFESSIONALS, ENGAGEMENT WITH AND IMPROVEMENT OF PRE-EXISTING SUPPORT MECHANISMS IN UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES OR OTHER TERTIARY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, AND THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL SUPPORT FUNCTION. 2. TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND ADVANCE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND/OR COUNSELLING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED BEREAVEMENT BY REASON OF THE SUICIDE OF YOUNG ADULTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO; THE SUICIDE OF YOUNG ADULTS ATTENDING, OR UNDERTAKING A COURSE OF STUDY, OR CONTEMPLATING A COURSE OF STUDY AT UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR OTHER TERTIARY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LLANWILCAE FARM
RHIWLAS
RAGLAN
USK
NP15 2JL
- Phone:
- 07522466504
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window