SCEPTRE OF MERCY MINISTRY AKA CARING ARMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Caring Arms is involved helping existing orphanges in rural areas in Nigeria. We help with feeding, clothes, education and other neccessities where possible. Caring Arms also cares for less privileged members of the society including widows. Our aim is to help them acquire neccessary skills to become self -sufficient. The charity is also into the advancement of the christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 May 2019: CIO registration
- CARING ARMS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMAMOKE IDEHEN | Chair | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARIEL YOCHANAN | Trustee | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 319 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 20 March 2023 | 412 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 15 April 2021 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
285 FULBOURNE ROAD
LONDON
E17 4HL
- Phone:
- 07598255059
- Email:
- somm.outreach@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window