YAKUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yakum helps indigenous communities reforest their land. Yakum works to protect indigenous forest and build territorial, cultural, medicinal and food sovereignty, through reforestation with carefully selected native tree species and territory mapping.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ecuador
Governance
- 31 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zygmunt de Goris Jedrzejowski ACMA | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Jane White MSc | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Francis Henry McFarlane-Watts BSc | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.70k | £21.00k | £28.80k | £66.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.43k | £1.79k | £47.18k | £55.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) INDIGENOUS COMMUNITIES THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND ECOLOGICAL ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) RESTORING VULNERABLE AND IMPORTANT ECOSYSTEMS USING REGENERATIVE AGROFORESTRY, TO PROVIDE ECONOMIC AND NUTRITIONAL ALTERNATIVES TO DEFORESTATION. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE RESTORATION, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL VIDEOS AND WORKSHOPS ON CLIMATE SCIENCE, DEFORESTATION, AGROFORESTRY FOR COMMUNITIES AND FOR SOCIAL MEDIA AND DOCUMENTING INFORMATION ON AMAZON USEFUL PLANTS AND THEIR MEDICINAL/NUTRITIONAL PROPERTIES TO SHARE AMONGST RAINFOREST PEOPLE. C. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (II) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS."
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BARKER CLOSE
RICHMOND
TW9 4ET
- Phone:
- 07710282340
- Email:
- info@yakum.org
- Website:
-
WWW.YAKUM.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window