GEMINI UNTWINED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding medical and scientific research into, and treatment of, craniopagus twins and other conditions potentially requiring craniofacial or neurosurgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Charles Park | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Dunaway | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward Kiely | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAMAL RAHMAN | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hayward | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Noor ul Owase Jeelani | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Savile | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.41k | £8.15k | £127.88k | £85.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.12k | £16.91k | £74.78k | £68.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE PROMOTION OF THE PHYSICAL, MATERIAL, MENTAL, FINANCIAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND THE FAMILIES OF CHILDREN WITH CONDITIONS POTENTIALLY REQUIRING CRANIO-FACIAL OR NEUROSURGERY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) CONJOINED TWINS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mishcon de Reya
Africa House
70 Kingsway
LONDON
WC2B 6AH
- Phone:
- 02085025374
- Email:
- INFO@GEMINIUNTWINED.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window