BIRMINGHAM COUNCIL OF MOSQUES (BCM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BCM WILL AIM FOR THE BELOW OBJECTIVES: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE WIDER WEST MIDLANDS MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE AREA OF BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE WITH BASIC NECESSITIES SUCH AS FOOD, CLOTHING AND HYGIENE PACKS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jawad Khan | Chair | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mahmood Dhalla | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ali | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.30k | £8.53k | £1.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £1.83k | £2.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 588 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 588 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
BCM WILL AIM FOR THE BELOW OBJECTIVES: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE WIDER WEST MIDLANDS MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE AREA OF BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE WITH BASIC NECESSITIES SUCH AS FOOD, CLOTHING AND HYGIENE PACKS. - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FAMILIES (WHO ARE ECONOMICALLY AND/OR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED) WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES OF BIRMINGHAM WITH ACCESS AND SUPPORT WITH BASIC SOCIAL/ECONOMIC SUPPORT IN THE FORM OF COUNSELLING EXTENDING TO SIA (SECURITY INDUSTRY AUTHORITY) TRAINING, SAFEGUARDING AND FIRST AID COURSES. - THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT IN THE BIRMINGHAM GREEN AREA (SPORTS BEING SPORTS OR GAMES WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH BY INVOLVING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE SPORTS OF FOOTBALL, CRICKET AND BADMINTON BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT (INCLUDING WORKING WITH AND SUPPORTING OTHER SIMILAR SPORTS CHARITIES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
188 Edward Road
Balsall Heath
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9LX
- Phone:
- 07464607901
- Email:
- bcmosques@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window