CHESTER ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHESTER ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY, PERFORMING AS CHESTER PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA, IS ONE OF THE NORTH WEST'S PREMIER NON-PROFESSIONAL ORCHESTRAS. WE HOLD 4 MAIN CONCERTS A YEAR, PARTICULARLY PROMOTING YOUNG SOLOISTS FROM THE AREA. OPPORTUNITIES EXIST FOR PEOPLE TO PLAY IN OR LISTEN TO VARIED PROGRAMMES OF CLASSICAL MUSIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 27 December 2018: CIO registration
- 22 May 2020: Funds received from 700688 CHESTER ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
- CHESTER PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Mary Anderson | Chair | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Mary McCraight | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dawn Slater | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rebecca Holmes | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET TAYLOR | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr James Andrew Warwick | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA JOAN STUBBS | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.96k | £3 | £31.38k | £31.91k | £32.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.14k | £4.14k | £29.23k | £30.32k | £33.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 MILL LANE
UPTON
CHESTER
CH2 1BS
- Phone:
- 01244380291
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window