MAYFLOWER PLAYGROUP, HAYWARDS HEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity replaces and incorporates the charity 1072441 The existing and new charity runs a pre-school playgroup located in Haywards Heath West Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £92,068 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 January 2019: CIO registration
- 11 January 2020: Funds received from 1072441 MAYFLOWER PLAYGROUP, HAYWARDS HEATH
- MAYFLOWER PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Claire Martin | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Nicholls | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Eggleton | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK JONATHAN VENTHAM | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jane McQuaker | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Samantha Joy Nicholls | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.64k | £107.20k | £103.64k | £110.14k | £117.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.24k | £99.39k | £120.23k | £105.75k | £108.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £85.67k | £81.59k | £90.07k | £92.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY AND CHRISTIAN TEACHING FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN FROM TWO TO FIVE YEARS OF AGE, IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES. (2) TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAYFLOWER PLAYGROUP
Christ Church
New England Road
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH16 3LE
- Phone:
- 01444459980
- Email:
- mayflower@cchh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window