Financial history THE MAGIC WISHING WELL

Charity Number: 1181843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.85k £66.66k £143.00k £53.39k £200.34k
Total expenditure £17.85k £51.87k £141.93k £48.13k £193.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A