Accounts and annual returns ELSIE'S MOON

Charity Number: 1181093
Charity reporting is up to date (297 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 August 2023 27 March 2025 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 August 2023 27 March 2025 297 days late
Annual return 03 August 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 August 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Annual return 03 August 2021 10 March 2023 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 August 2021 10 March 2023 280 days late
Annual return 03 August 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 August 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 03 August 2019 15 July 2020 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 August 2019 15 July 2020 42 days late