BOLTON VILLAS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bolton Villas Family Church exists to promote the Christian faith, we do this by providing regular public worship for all and aim to teach people about the love of Jesus through all our various activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,008 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 22 November 2018: Standard registration
- 13 April 2023: Funds received from 226803 THORNTON FUND
- BOLTON VILLAS FAMILY CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Haley | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Brookes | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Flerin | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Marguerite Helen Sobol BA DipLib | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.65k | £103.38k | £107.79k | £105.86k | £112.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.46k | £104.05k | £101.68k | £116.75k | £117.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £132 | £14.17k | £12.31k | £2.50k | £3.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ACTS (1972 AND 1981) AND SCHEME OF UNION (1972) ADOPTED 18 JUN 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHEME OF UNION OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOLTON VILLAS FAMILY CHURCH
LIVINGSTONE CLOSE
BRADFORD
BD2 1PZ
- Phone:
- 01274449606
- Email:
- info@bvurc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window