BRIXTON CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities description
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £59,600 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Schumann | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hester Warner | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Henry Little | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Geraldine Glennon | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.26k | £40.35k | £106.87k | £189.63k | £290.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.43k | £38.13k | £92.05k | £174.87k | £291.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.20k | £22.50k | £23.20k | £36.50k | £59.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ART OF MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND TO PROMOTE, SUSTAIN, AND INCREASE INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE OF MUSIC, BY PROVIDING PUBLIC CONCERTS AND SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE ORGANISATION, THROUGH ITS BOARD OF TRUSTEES, SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 Shakespeare Road
Lambeth
SE24 0PY
- Phone:
- 07495074286
- Email:
- brixchamber@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window