Financial history WEST KENT COMMUNITY RADIO

Charity Number: 1180738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £13.65k £55.88k £30.06k £26.07k
Total expenditure £0 £2.99k £33.57k £30.37k £37.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.50k N/A N/A £300