GATESHEAD MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Producing and performing musical productions with the company, providing an opportunity for both males and females of all ages, abilities and backgrounds with full inclusion and without discrimination through performing arts, dance, drama and music. To encourage all members to reach their full potential in a safe and caring environment and cultivate and encourage public appreciation of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 21 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Brannigan-Howes | Chair | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Routledge | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Nugent | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Routledge | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Kyle | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bannerman | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Thompson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lena Johnson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stafford | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.64k | £6.26k | £2.50k | £16.89k | £16.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.16k | £5.49k | £2.35k | £15.13k | £8.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £199 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 September 2024 | 392 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 September 2024 | 392 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 April 2023 | 215 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH PERFORMING ARTS, DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Torquay Gardens
GATESHEAD
Tyne And Wear
NE9 6XB
- Phone:
- 07703667491
- Email:
- GatesheadMTC@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window