THE BIRSHAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants in line with its charitable objectives. Please note, no unsolicited requests are accepted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Elizabeth Birshan | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Isaac Birshan | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.41k | £30.12k | £48.15k | £50.37k | £70.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.65k | £29.03k | £49.99k | £49.16k | £66.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, BY MAKING GRANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Wood Lane
LONDON
N6 5UB
- Phone:
- 02037555421
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window