Financial history THE RHYS JONES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1181110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.12k £31.18k £23.51k £48.58k £49.32k
Total expenditure £55.46k £39.90k £28.11k £62.68k £46.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.32k £10.03k N/A £29.97k £34.03k