VENICE IN PERIL FUND CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the preservation of the historic and artistic legacy of Venice by funding conservation projects and promoting deeper public understanding of its contribution to world culture. Assisting the work of Venice's cultural institutions, supporting the training of conservation professionals and working with other committees actively involved in rescue and restoration work in Venice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Italy
Governance
- 05 December 2019: CIO registration
- VENICE IN PERIL FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Elliott | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Roberts | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CONTE GERI DELLA ROCCA DE CANDAL | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
LADY SHEILA HALE | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
RICHARD HASLAM | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
SARAH QUILL | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
JON DAVIS EMANUEL RAYMAN | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor Deborah Howard | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £368.47k | £363.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £440.74k | £447.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION OF THE ANTIQUITIES, HISTORIC BUILDINGS, MONUMENTS, ARCHIVES AND WORKS OF ART SITUATED IN VENICE AND ON THE ISLANDS OF THE VENETIAN LAGOON BY. A)PROMOTING DEEPER PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF VENICE, ITS COMPLEX HISTORY AND THE CONTRIBUTION IT HAS MADE TO WORLD CULTURE AND THE CHALLENGES IT FACES TODAY, SO AS TO ENCOURAGE RESPONSIBLE AND INFORMED ENGAGEMENT WITH THE CITY. B)ASSISTING THE WORK OF VENICE'S CULTURAL INSTITUTIONS, SUPPORT THE TRAINING OF CONSERVATION PROFESSIONALS AND TO WORK WITH OTHER COMMITTEES ACTIVELY INVOLVED IN RESCUE AND RESTORATION WORK IN VENICE. C) REVITALISING THE CITY OF VENICE AS A CULTURAL CENTRE OF IMPORTANCE TO THE WHOLE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Venice in Peril Fund CIO
70 Cowcross Street
London
EC1M 6EJ
- Phone:
- 02077366891
- Email:
- info@veniceinperil.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window