Financial history CHARLES LORD-DENTON ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1182011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.80k £18.91k £24.75k £20.66k £19.67k
Total expenditure £18.76k £24.70k £8.91k £19.40k £20.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A