FLAMING BIBLE CHURCH UK NORTH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with other charities such as Young Minds Trust and Age UK through donations to support young and old people in the Uk. Assisting old and disable people with their shopping, cleaning their homes ,cancelling young boys with behavioral issues. Provide tutorial for primary, secondary and university students. Provide Music lessons for all age. Help children with education and welfare in Africa,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Enfield
- Hackney
- The Gambia
Governance
- 17 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sahr Marrah | Chair | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Ivan Luke | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.48k | £11.15k | £14.63k | £22.43k | £29.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £7.24k | £15.31k | £22.19k | £25.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2021 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2021 | 369 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH PARTS OF NORTH LONDON, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; 2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SICKNESS AND WHO MAY BE AGED AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Fouracres
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN3 5DR
- Phone:
- 07808892341
- Email:
- sahrmarrah@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window