THE GREYHOUND SHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of greyhounds and other sighthounds both in the UK and abroad who are in need of care and attention and protect such dogs from cruelty or abandonment, by providing temporary shelter for the reception, care and treatment of such dogs and placing greyhounds in suitable permanent homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUSTIN CALDWELL | Chair | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL JOY HUGHES | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CAROL BAKER | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.63k | £54.78k | £48.97k | £50.42k | £48.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.94k | £50.10k | £34.92k | £53.23k | £35.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.22k | £8.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO RAISE AND DISTRIBUTE FUNDS FOR THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND TO AID THE REHOMING OF GREYHOUND AND OTHER SIGHTHOUNDS BOTH IN THE UK AND ABROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 LIBRARY ROAD
POOLE
BH12 2BQ
- Phone:
- 01202245054
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window