THE RANK PRIZE FUNDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Funds include the advancement and promotion for the public benefit of knowledge, education and learning in all or any of the following sciences: Crop husbandry; Human nutrition; Animal nutrition; and the inter-face between optics and electronics and related phenomena. The Funds operate throughout England, Wales and Scotland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 June 2019: Standard registration
- 26 October 2019: Funds received from 263819 THE RANK PRIZE FUND
- RANK PRIZE FUND (Working name)
- THE RANK PRIZE FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Stuart Huxley Cowen | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Madden-Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW EDWARD COWEN | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julia Stretton Higgins | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR WILLIAM ARNOT WAKEHAM | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Donal Bradley | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Susan Taylor | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Cummings Mathers | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £370.28k | £456.00k | £288.00k | £353.00k | £407.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.18k | £549.00k | £869.00k | £869.00k | £861.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING SCIENCES: A. NUTRITION, NAMELY THE SCIENCE OF (I) CROP HUSBANDRY (II) HUMAN NUTRITION AND (III) ANIMAL NUTRITION AS DISTINCT FROM ANIMAL HUSBANDRY; AND B. THE INTERFACE BETWEEN THE SCIENCE OF OPTICS AND THE SCIENCE OF ELECTRONICS (KNOWN AS "OPTO-ELECTRONICS") AND IN CLOSELY RELATED PHENOMENA, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SYMPOSIUMS, AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO FUND RESEARCH IN THE ABOVE SCIENCES, LEADING TO THE EVENTUAL DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH BY THOSE CONDUCTING THE RESEARCH. 2. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19-21 Garden Walk
LONDON
EC2A 3EQ
- Phone:
- 02078347731
- Email:
- enquiries@rankprize.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window