Trustees Trelawnyd Memorial Hall and Community Association
Charity number: 1184352

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruby Bridget Richards | Chair | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Papworth | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gwawr Angharad Cooper | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alun Hughes | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HENRY ELLIS | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MIlenka Pilar Le Vay | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Taylor | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID John SMITH | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|||||
William Roger Jones | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Evan M ed | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Rose | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.