WOLVERHAMPTON INTER-FAITH GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 13 December 1982: Standard registration
- 05 July 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 July 2006: Funds transferred to 1114265 INTERFAITH WOLVERHAMPTON
- W I F G (Working name)
- WIFG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.25k | £28.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.12k | £25.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 20 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 11 May 2006 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 11 May 2006 | 100 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 18 February 2005 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 18 February 2005 | 18 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 1980 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 3 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
SHALL BE TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF RELIGIOUS FAITHS SECTS AND DENOMINATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window