Accounts and annual returns BILIM UZBEK CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1184559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 December 2024 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 November 2024 666 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required