LYME DISEASE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lyme Disease UK strives to raise awareness of Lyme disease and provide support for those suffering from the illness. We operate online but also attend and host a range of events. Our aim is to raise money to continue spreading awareness but also to help fund research and patient grants in the future. We are very active on social media and we provide a wealth of information on our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 February 2019: CIO registration
- LDUK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Elizabeth Metcalf | Chair | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Herbert | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Herbert | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Knight | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/02/2020 | 25/02/2021 | 25/02/2022 | 25/02/2023 | 25/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.38k | £23.73k | £45.29k | £34.83k | £43.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.40k | £14.30k | £31.70k | £45.13k | £37.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 February 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 February 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 February 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 February 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OF LYME DISEASE AND THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH LYME DISEASE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT THE CAUSES AND DANGERS OF LYME DISEASE AND WAYS TO PREVENT TICK BITES; (2) PROVIDING AND PUBLISHING INFORMATION ABOUT LYME DISEASE AND WHERE PRACTICAL HELP AND SUPPORT CAN BE FOUND FOR SUFFERERS; (3) MAKING GRANTS TO FUND RESEARCH INTO LYME DISEASE AND THE TREATMENT OF THE DISEASE, PROVIDED THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED; (4) WORKING WITH OTHERS TO SUPPORT IMPROVEMENTS TO THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF LYME DISEASE, INCLUDING TO THE NATIONAL GUIDELINES FOR DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND CARE; (5) MAKING GRANTS TO PAY FOR PERSONAL CARE AND OTHER CHARITABLE SHORT OR LONG TERM NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LYME DISEASE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lyme Disease UK (LDUK)
Lytchett House
13 Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Poole
Dorset
- Phone:
- 01202022437
- Email:
- admin@lymediseaseuk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.