CENTRE FOR SPORT AND HUMAN RIGHTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for Sport and Human Rights is a human rights organisation for the world of sport who's role is to work towards a world of sport that fully respects human rights through collective action and through the promotion of the Sporting Chance Principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,737,187
Donations and legacies | £3.64m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £94.48k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,653,558
Raising funds | £51.74k | |
Charitable activities | £2.57m | |
Other | £29.78k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £81.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.57m | |
Retained for future use | £1.08m |
People

8 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 29 January 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moira Thompson Oliver | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Gaillard | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Jennings | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brent Wilton | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorcas Amakobe | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60m | £2.19m | £1.08m | £3.74m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12m | £1.54m | £1.61m | £2.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.60m | £2.19m | £1.08m | £3.64m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £94.48k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.11m | £1.53m | £1.54m | £2.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.26k | £11.56k | £57.86k | £51.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.50k | £2.50k | £3.75k | £3.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £3.56k | £29.78k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.69k | £7.62k | £8.41k | £8.52k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £617.37k | £1.32m | £974.44k | £1.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £105.64k | £162.70k | £350.44k | £164.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) WITHIN THE WORLD OF SPORT (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SPORTING CHANCE PRINCIPLE) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS 2. OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; 3. RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE 4. RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 5. PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; 6. CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; 7. COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; 8. RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 9. PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; 10. PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND ENTERPRISES; 11. INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 12. ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE DIRECTORS SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE DIRECTORS ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19C COMMERCIAL ROAD
EASTBOURNE
EAST SUSSEX
BN21 3XE
- Phone:
- 0041 22 548 34 41
- Email:
- info@sporthumanrights.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window