THE BARLASTON HALL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains a disused church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 November 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES DOUGLAS ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £4 | £4 | £2.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247 | £1.54k | £248 | £248 | £247 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST OR ANCIENT MONUMENTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE BUILDING KNOWN AS BARLASTON HALL IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARLASTON HALL
QUEEN MARYS DRIVE
BARLASTON
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST12 9AT
- Phone:
- 01782 372396
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window