LANDSKER TRUST

Charity number: 1184217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting care leavers to access employment training and education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,000
Total expenditure: £983

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 July 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nuala Sharpe Chair 11 October 2018
None on record
Daniel Pryke Trustee 11 October 2018
HAVERFORDWEST SKATEPARK ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Sharmaine Wendy Christine Jones Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
Paul James Thomas Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £750 £0 £2.19k £850 £1.00k
Total expenditure £1.49k £0 £959 £946 £983
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2024 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 March 2024 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 March 2024 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 March 2024 412 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 March 2024 772 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 March 2024 777 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 March 2024 1137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 March 2024 1142 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LANDSKER TRUST
THE OLD CORN STORE
NORTHFIELD ROAD
NARBERTH
SA67 7AA
Phone:
01834862888
Website:

No information available