QUILTER INVESTORS CHARITY AUTHORISED INVESTMENT FUNDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a Charity Authorised Investment Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Citibank UK Limited | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Quilter Investors Limited | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £787.00k | £2.57m | £3.79m | £4.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £990.00k | £3.08m | £4.47m | £5.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED EXCLUSIVELY TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITIES THAT DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY HOLD UNITS IN THE TRUST FROM TIME TO TIME, PROVIDED THAT IF AT ANY TIME THERE ARE NO UNITHOLDERS, THE TRUST SHALL HAVE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE MANAGER AND TRUSTEE (WHICH ARE BOTH THE CHARITY TRUSTEES OF THE TRUST) SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUILTER INVESTORS LIMITED
SENATOR HOUSE
85 QUEEN VICTORIA STREET
LONDON
EC4V 4AB
- Phone:
- 02073327600
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window