LYMM & THELWALL U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's object ('the object') is the advancement of education and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warrington
Governance
- 14 March 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allen James Sealby | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Owen | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Bryant | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marguerite Bower | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Margaret Holloway | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Arthur Charles King | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Doris Muriel Howarth | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Penelope Dale | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Mitchell | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Bower | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.76k | £1.70k | £5.20k | £12.43k | £19.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.61k | £2.35k | £6.40k | £10.16k | £15.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ('THE OBJECT') IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Scholars Green Lane
LYMM
Cheshire
WA13 0QA
- Phone:
- 07803937002
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window