YOUTH SHEDZ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Shedz aims to develop a community to reach the most disconnected young people by providing safe spaces for young people aged 13 to 25 to explore their identity and develop pro-social relationships, alongside positive role models. Each Youth Shed is co-produced by participants who are supported and facilitated to test ideas and concepts which help them to build healthier, fulfilling lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Harrison | Chair | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Catherine Matthews | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Thomas Webster | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER CALDWELL | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Jeremy | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.23k | £90.55k | £81.16k | £131.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.75k | £79.86k | £87.70k | £101.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | £26.95k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE, JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND LEARN TO PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Bryn Marl Road
Mochdre
COLWYN BAY
Clwyd
LL28 5EA
- Phone:
- 07766836067
- Email:
- Scott@youthshedz.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window