THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL, MYTHOLMROYD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council of the parish of St Michael, Mytholmroyd serves the local community by providing a place of worship, Christian religious teaching and pastoral care to the community of Mytholmroyd.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 21 February 2019: Standard registration
- MYTHOLMROYD PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Anne Alston | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Marianne Wrathall | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jackson | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ROYLANCE WRATHALL | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Wilfred Henry Franklin | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Gladney Howarth | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Robinson | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Joan Garbutt | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Carolyn Horsford B.A. | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ERIC ALSTON | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.67k | £44.10k | £65.40k | £98.89k | £91.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.57k | £75.27k | £79.21k | £77.89k | £72.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.89k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS CHURCH HALL
CHURCH STREET
MYTHOLMROYD
HEBDEN BRIDGE
HX7 5DS
- Phone:
- 01422883944
- Email:
- reardoncathy@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window