NASEBY VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and management of village hall and recreation ground
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 19 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Hyde | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Knight | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Smith | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.57k | £19.67k | £41.70k | £24.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.27k | £13.70k | £29.64k | £23.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 January 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NASEBY AND ITS SURROUNDS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Naseby Village Hall
Haselbech Road
Newlands
Naseby
Northampton
NN6 6DE
- Phone:
- 08445041905
- Email:
- nasebyvillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window