THE NORTH HOLDERNESS MUSEUM OF VILLAGE LIFE (HORNSEA MUSEUM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity is to preserve for the Community and the nation; local history, architectural and cultural heritage that may exist in and around North Holderness in the form of buildings and artefacts of particular historical, architectural and cultural interests. The museum also puts on events for the local community, such as paranormal nights and 1940's street party days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- HORNSEA MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
nial adams | Chair | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Stewart Mills | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Allen | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
sarah clare curtis | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
susan rhodes | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
nicholas burton | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
andrew sidwell | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JENNIFER PEACOCK | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julian Geoffrey Musik | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.97k | £40.46k | £40.49k | £47.51k | £35.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.50k | £31.12k | £32.13k | £62.07k | £38.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.61k | £27.93k | £27.93k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND RUNNING OF A MUSEUM AND TO PROMOTE INTEREST IN AND RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY, CRAFTS, DIALECT CUSTOMS AND NATURAL HISTORY DEVELOPMENT OF NORTH HOLDERNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORNSEA MUSEUM
11-17 NEWBEGIN
HORNSEA
HU18 1AB
- Phone:
- 01964533443
- Email:
- hornseamuseum.info@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window