CENTRE FOR CHAPLAINCY IN EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian Religion for the public benefit through the development of Chaplaincy in Schools, colleges and other educational institutions. Supporting, resourcing and encoraging Chaplians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 October 2019: CIO registration
- 05 February 2020: Funds received from 271220 THE SCHOOL CHAPLAINS AND LEADERS ASSOCIATION
- CCE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Henry Haslam | Chair | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Parrales | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Anne McGlown | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN GOLDING | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Justin Michael White | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bryan | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Orla Kearns | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev GARRY REGINALD NEAVE | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.80k | £230.70k | £19.33k | £20.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.18k | £201.16k | £125.71k | £8.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
- TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHAPLAINCY IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS. - TO ADVOCATE THE BENEFITS TO STUDENTS, STAFF AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF HIGH-QUALITY CHAPLAINCY PROVISION IN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG CHURCHES, FAITH BODIES, FUNDING, REGULATORY AND GOVERNMENT BODIES, AND TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN THE UK OR ELSEWHERE. - TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE MORAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF STUDENTS OF ALL FAITHS AND BELIEFS BY THE PRODUCTION OF RESOURCES, SEMINARS, TALKS, MEETINGS AND NETWORKS TO SHARE BEST PRACTICE IN CHAPLAINCY. - TO IDENTIFY, ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT APPROPRIATE AND EFFECTIVE APPROACHES TO PASTORAL CARE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG STUDENTS AND OTHER MEMBERS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS WHO ARE VULNERABLE OR SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
114 MOUNT STREET
LONDON
W1K 3AY
- Phone:
- 07309677235
- Email:
- info@c4ce.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window