Shree Krishna Resource Centre of Leamington and Warwick

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF HINDU RELIGION in accordance with the tenets and doctrines of Hinduism for the benefit of the Public. The Charity facilitates Religious / Cultural activities, offers a principle place for public prayers and private worship. We employ a Minister of Religion to preform Hindu Rites associated with Births, Deaths, Marriages and PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES IN A CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 August 2019: CIO registration
- SHRI KRISHNA ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- SHRI KRISHNA INDOOR SPORTS CLUB (Working name)
- SHRI KRISHNA MANDIR (Working name)
- SHRI KRISHNA TEMPLE (Working name)
- SHRI KRISHNA RESOURCE CENTRE OF LEAMINGTON AND WARWICK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dharm Veer Awesti | Chair | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brijinder Kumar Gupta | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Choudhury | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vikas Agarwal | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Baldev Manan | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chander Deep Sahjpall | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rajinder Pal Sharma | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Gian Kanwar | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Naveen Tangri | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £90.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £22.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 April 2022 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 April 2022 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Aug 2019 as amended on 11 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
‘TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN WARWICKSHIRE AND THE UK, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF HINDUISM THROUGH, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, THE PROVISION OF A TEMPLE.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
10B HIGH STREET
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV31 3AN
- Phone:
- 07877250983
- Email:
- skm.lspa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window