WOODCOTE PRE-SCHOOL GROUP CIO

Charity Number: 1180857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide full day care from 8.30am to 3.30pm for children aged 18 months to 5 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £90,570
Total expenditure: £85,217

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 2018: CIO registration
  • 16 September 2021: Funds received from 1020592 WOODCOTE PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Louise Reid Chair 28 February 2024
None on record
Wendy Margaret Powell Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Jade Powell Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Russell Page Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Maxine Townsend Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £0 £30 £76.12k £73.48k £90.57k
Total expenditure £0 £54 £62.98k £78.65k £85.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £44.11k £38.84k £41.77k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 08 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 08 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 16 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 24 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 09 June 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 June 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 19 June 2020 19 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Woodcote Pre-school Group CIO
Woodcote Village Hall
Reading Road
Woodcote
RG8 0QY
Phone:
01491682300