LIBERTY JAMBOREE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Liberty Jamboree support young people and young adults with special educational needs to engage in positive activities and engage in fulfilling experience within their community. Liberty Jamboree offer social and educational opportunities which supports the emotional and social development of the people involved
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £32,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £32,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Telford & Wrekin
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 15 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Hall BEM. | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE WALKER | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMMA CLAYTON | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Atkins | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HALL | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BARNES | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Barnett | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Steventon | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK CLAYTON | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA KERMAN | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Keegan Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.71k | £235.88k | £305.09k | £431.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.78k | £187.59k | £296.25k | £386.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.00k | £57.19k | N/A | £32.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £5.15k | £54.10k | £32.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Oct 2019 as amended on 25 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE/ADULTS IN STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, DISABILITIES (SEND) AND MENTAL ILL HEALTH FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THESE PEOPLE AND FAMILIES BY ASSISTING THEM TO BE INTEGRATED INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 SALTCROFT
HAWKS YARD
ARMITAGE
STAFFORDSHIRE
WS15 1SR
- Phone:
- 07772749661
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window