THE LLANGIWG TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ensuring that the former Llangiwg Church, a heritage site, remains accessible to the general public on a regular basis by opening the building for tours and visits, and by making it available to anyone as a 'peaceful space' for meditation/quiet time sessions. Developing a programme of talks and lectures about all aspects of Llangiwg and its environs, along with accompanying educational material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 22 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Diane Butler | Chair | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Meiriona Davies | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Toye | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Littler | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Harvey Williams | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Lukas | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £573 | £5.58k | £2.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £778 | £278 | £6.19k | £830 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
A)THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE FORMER ST CIWG'S CHURCH AT LLANGIWG, YNYSMEUDWY. B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF LLANGIWG AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. C)TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LLANGIWG AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 RHESTR FAWR
YSTRADGYNLAIS
SWANSEA
SA9 1LD
- Phone:
- 07904921896
- Email:
- julie.d.butler444@gmail.com
- Website:
-
llangiwgtrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window