Financial history Harry's Hydrocephalus Awareness Trust

Charity number: 1183086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.23k £35.52k £53.10k £190.04k £199.72k
Total expenditure £9.73k £14.50k £32.90k £101.02k £141.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.31k N/A £1.75k N/A N/A