SWAP (SAFE WELCOME AFTER PRISON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a day centre for individuals with a history of criminal offending, mental health and addiction and assisting them in various ways including: Universal Credit claims and managing Universal Credit accounts. Escorting to various appointments. Setting up email accounts, council tax, utilities, etc. Making appointments with healthcare providers and probation services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 01 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shane Ingham | Chair | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice McNamara | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brendon Bennett | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE OLIVER | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Saltonstall | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.66k | £64.74k | £58.60k | £52.12k | £23.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.68k | £57.67k | £56.56k | £44.92k | £37.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF EX-OFFENDERS LIVING IN HALIFAX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, BUDDYING, ASSESSMENT AND INDUCTION PROGRAMMES, AS WELL AS A DAY CENTRE SERVICE, TRIPS AND ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Akeds Road
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX1 2TR
- Phone:
- 01422880762
- Website:
-
safewelcomeafterprison.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window