SITA WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity, as stated in its governing document, are to: 1) Relief sickness and the preservation of health in India and other parts of the world in particular, but not exclusively, by providing or assisting in the provision of medical and healthcare advice and information. 2) To advance the education of children and young people who are socially and economically disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 23 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Surendra Kumar Verma | Chair | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jay Verma | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR SUKIN NATARAJAN | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anju Verma | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARBRINDER SIDHU | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.26k | £6.18k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £938 | £958 | £7.92k | £2.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 10 December 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 10 December 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN INDIA AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AND HEALTHCARE ADVICE AND INFORMATION. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN INDIA, BY MAKING GRANTS TO HELP FUND THEIR EDUCATION AT SCHOOL, COLLEGE OR UNIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARD WILLIAMS BUSINESS ADVISORS LTD
BAY LODGE
36 HAREFIELD ROAD
UXBRIDGE
UB8 1PH
- Phone:
- 07566887521
- Email:
- sitawelfaretrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window